Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Spicer, David, filed a(n) Tto Tort - Other case represented by Buckley, Erica Beth, Sadler, Jeffrey Howard, against State Of Washington, represented by Sterett, Richard Reese, in the jurisdiction of Yakima County, WA, . Yakima County, WA Superior Courts with Susan C. Arb presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSusan C. Arb Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 19, 2021 |
CategoryTto Tort - Other |
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationYakima County, WA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 20, 2024 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial-12 6-DAYS |
|
August 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Case Schedule -2nd Amended Judge: Boswell, Jared A |
|
August 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial-12 6 DAYS/ JURY 12 |
|
July 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice for Trial Setting (JY-12 05/20/2024 @9:30 AM 6-DAYS) |
|
July 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Stipulation | |
July 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order for Continuance of Trial Date
Judge: Arb, Susan |
|
June 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Case Schedule -AMENDED Judge: Arb, Susan |
|
May 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Witness List | |
May 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Confirmation of Joinder | |
February 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Summary Judgment amended notice |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.