Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Rothamel, Elizabeth M, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Brumback, Michael Scott, against Sanchez, Jane Doe, Sanchez, Juan J, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co., represented by Luloff, Gary R., in the jurisdiction of Yakima County, WA, . Yakima County, WA Superior Courts with Susan C. Arb presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSusan C. Arb Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 14, 2021 |
CategoryTmv Tort - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedAugust 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationYakima County, WA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
November 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal With Prejudice
Judge: Arb, Susan |
|
October 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Appointment as Arbitrator | |
September 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Arbitration Award | |
May 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Answer and Affirmative Defense | |
October 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service AMENDED |
|
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Affidavit OF SERVICE |
|
August 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
July 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Summons and Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.