Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Alejandre, Fidel Munguia, Sr, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by De La Cruz, Vito R., Kreutz, Jeffrey Martin, against Bosma Estate Winery, Llc, Bosma, Julia, Garcia-Pardo, Bernardo, Garcia-Pardo, Jane Doe, represented by Becker, Catherine Ann, Smith, Elizabeth Grace, in the jurisdiction of Yakima County, WA, . Yakima County, WA Superior Courts with Kevin S. Naught presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKevin S. Naught Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 30, 2021 |
CategoryPin Personal Injury |
Last RefreshedAugust 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationYakima County, WA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial-12 10 DAYS/ JURY 12 |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal With Prejudice STIP |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Receipts -OF FUNDS INTO A BLOCKED ACCOUNT |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Approving Settlement -MINIOR FOR FIDEL ALEJANDRE AVILA, JR Judge: Naught, Kevin S |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Petition -FOR ORDER APPROVING MINOR SETTLEMENT |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Report of Guardian Ad Litem | |
November 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem
Judge: Tutsch, Elisabeth M |
|
November 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Petition for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem | |
November 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Change of Address | |
September 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Disclosure |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.