Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Kizziar, Isaiah W, Kizziar, Valerie R, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Gilbert, Russell Harold, against Gonzalez And Sons Carpentry Llc, Gonzalez, Ernesto, Gonzalez, Hortencia, represented by Montoya, Kevan Tino, in the jurisdiction of Yakima County, WA, . Yakima County, WA Superior Courts with Jeffrey B. Swan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJeffrey B. Swan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 17, 2021 |
CategoryCbc Contractor Bond Complaint |
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationYakima County, WA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing (MG) RULINGS ON MOTION TO COMPEL AND FEES ON RECORD; CRT G/S ORDER ON MOTION; (MONTOYA / GILBERT); CM SCFTR3 Judge: Swan, Jeffery |
|
November 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Swan, Jeffery |
|
November 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order to Compel
Judge: Swan, Jeffery |
|
October 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Note for Motion Docket | |
October 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion to Compel | |
July 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order -STIP. WITHDRAWING DISQUALIFICATION Judge: Naught, Kevin S |
|
May 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Hearing Stricken In Court Other Reason (MM) CNSL STRCK PR TO CRT, CM, FTR SC4 Judge: Gibson, Blaine G |
|
May 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel
Judge: Gibson, Blaine G |
|
May 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Note for Motion Docket RENOTE -3RD |
|
May 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion Hearing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.