Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Arroyo, Gregorio, filed a(n) Msc2 Miscellaneous - Civil case represented by Valencia, Erika, against Bosma, Jake, Liberty Dairy Llc, Lugo, Celso, represented by Simpson, Arthur, in the jurisdiction of Yakima County, WA, . Yakima County, WA Superior Courts with Blaine G. Gibson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBlaine G. Gibson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 05, 2021 |
CategoryMsc2 Miscellaneous - Civil |
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationYakima County, WA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 14, 2024 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial-12 10 Days |
|
August 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Case Schedule
Judge: Boswell, Jared A |
|
August 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice | |
July 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing (SLB) (SIMPSON) SIMPSON TO GET FINAL ORDRS TO JUDGE ON MONDAY; FTRSC3 Judge: Gibson, Blaine G |
|
July 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Gibson, Blaine G |
|
July 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice | |
July 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Hearing
Judge: Rodriguez-True, Sonia |
|
July 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice for Trial Setting (JY-12 10/14/2024 @ 9:30 AM 10-DAYS) |
|
July 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order of Continuance
Judge: Gibson, Blaine G |
|
July 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Gibson, Blaine G |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.