Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Sperle, Mary P, Sperle, Randy L, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Brumback, Michael Scott, against Amodio, John Doe, Amodio, Lori R, Yakima County, represented by Dynan, Mark J., in the jurisdiction of Yakima County, WA, . Yakima County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 16, 2021 |
CategoryTmv Tort - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedAugust 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationYakima County, WA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice Withdraw and Substitution of Counsel | |
June 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Status Report | |
June 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Clerks Notice for Dismissal for Want of Prosecution | |
April 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Answer TO COMPLAINT |
|
April 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Affidavit OF SERVICE |
|
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
March 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Summons and Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.