Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Pacwest Funding, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Anders, Scott St. Clair, against City Of Yakima, Northwest Investment Holdings #19, Llc, Reconveyance Professionals, Inc, Redmond Funding Croup, Llc, Yakima County, (total of 5) See All represented by Bleek, Ryan, in the jurisdiction of Yakima County, WA, . Yakima County, WA Superior Courts with Susan C. Arb presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSusan C. Arb Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 25, 2021 |
CategoryFor Foreclosure |
Last RefreshedAugust 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationYakima County, WA |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order (ARB, ORDERS G/S IN CHAMBERS.) Judge: Arb, Susan |
|
July 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
July 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal Without Prejudice
Judge: Arb, Susan |
|
March 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
March 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Return of Service | |
February 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
February 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Answer | |
January 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Summons and Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.