Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Peralta, L, Peralta, Miguel Anglel, Peralta, Rhea, Peralta, S M, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Locher, Georgia Trejo, against Blakely, Bradley J, Blakely, Jane Doe, Does 1-10, Emergency Associates Of Yakima, Pllc, Yakima Valley Memorial Hospital Association, (total of 5) See All represented by Aiken, Jerome R., Murphy, Megan, in the jurisdiction of Yakima County, WA, . Yakima County, WA Superior Courts with Blaine G. Gibson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBlaine G. Gibson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 20, 2021 |
CategoryMed Medical Malpractice |
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationYakima County, WA |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 05, 2024 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial-12 12-DAY |
|
August 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Recusal of Judge NAUGHT |
|
August 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order of Preassignment
Judge: Gibson, Blaine G |
|
August 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Assignment | |
June 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice for Trial Setting (JY-12 08/05/2024 @ 9:30 AM 12 DAYS) |
|
June 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Order Setting Case Schedule | |
May 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Case Schedule -NO JUDGE SIGNATURE |
|
January 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Mandate | |
May 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
Transmittal Letter Copy Filed 3RD SPTL CP 449-453 SNET TO COA. RE #80, #81. |
|
March 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Index THIRD SPPTL TO CP 449-453. RE #80. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.