Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
De La Cruz, Eric, filed a(n) Msc2 Miscellaneous - Civil case represented by Valencia, Erika, against Apple Tree Construction Company, Apple Tree Golf Course, Apple Tree J B Borton Family, Llc, Apple Tree Land Company, Llc, Apple Tree Partnership, Llc, (total of 6) See All represented by Montoya, Kevan Tino, in the jurisdiction of Yakima County, WA, . Yakima County, WA Superior Courts with Blaine G. Gibson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBlaine G. Gibson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 21, 2020 |
CategoryMsc2 Miscellaneous - Civil |
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationYakima County, WA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 05, 2024 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial-12 9 Days Judge: Gibson, Blaine G |
|
September 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Presentation of Order
Judge: Gibson, Blaine G |
|
July 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Presentation -AMENDED |
|
July 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Presentation of Order
Judge: Gibson, Blaine G |
|
July 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Absence Unavailability | |
June 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Presentation -SECOND AMENDED |
|
June 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Presentation -AMENDED |
|
March 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice for Trial Setting (JY12; 02/25/24; 9:30AM; 9D) |
|
August 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Presentation of Order
Judge: Gibson, Blaine G |
|
August 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order of Continuance
Judge: Gibson, Blaine G |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.