Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Hla Engineering And Land Surveying, Inc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Thorner, Michael Jerome, against Reclaiming Company, Llc, Western Surety Company, represented by Friedrich, Paul Keane, in the jurisdiction of Yakima County, WA, . Yakima County, WA Superior Courts with Blaine G. Gibson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBlaine G. Gibson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 31, 2019 |
CategoryCol Collection |
Last RefreshedAugust 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationYakima County, WA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Clerks Order of Dismissal | |
July 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Closure by Clerk | |
June 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Clerks Notice for Dismissal for Want of Prosecution | |
April 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Intent to Withdraw | |
February 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Gibson, Blaine G |
|
February 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Substitution of Counsel | |
February 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
Note for Motion Docket RE-NOTE |
|
February 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
Default RENEWAL Judge: Gibson, Blaine G |
|
January 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
Note for Motion Docket - RENOTE |
|
January 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
Hearing Stricken In Court NonAppearance (MG) FTR2 Judge: Gibson, Blaine G |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.