Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Meyers, Nicholas E, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Johnson, Jeffrey R., against Allstate Property And Casualty Insurance Company, represented by Widney, Allison Mae, in the jurisdiction of Yakima County, WA, . Yakima County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 12, 2021 |
CategoryTmv Tort - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedMay 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationYakima County, WA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
April 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal
Judge: Arb, Susan |
|
March 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Status Report | |
March 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Clerks Notice for Dismissal for Want of Prosecution | |
December 16, 2019 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
December 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
Demand for Jury 12 Person ($250 PD) |
|
December 09, 2019 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
December 09, 2019 | Docket Event | Answer | |
December 09, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
October 22, 2019 | Docket Event | Summons and Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.