Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Dragoo, Scott, filed a(n) Msc2 Miscellaneous - Civil case represented by Kube, Paul S, against Fruit Packers Supply, Inc., represented by Wixson, Sarah Lynn Clarke, in the jurisdiction of Yakima County, WA, . Yakima County, WA Superior Courts with Susan C. Arb presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSusan C. Arb Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 22, 2019 |
CategoryMsc2 Miscellaneous - Civil |
Last RefreshedAugust 19, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationYakima County, WA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial-12 5 DAYS/JURY 12 |
|
October 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
October 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal Stipulated
Judge: Arb, Susan |
|
July 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
May 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order RE: CONTEMPT Judge: Harthcock, Gayle M |
|
May 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing (MM) PRTS AGRD TO DEPO OF D. ATTERBURY ON 6/10; D. ATTERBURY TO ACCPT SERV VIA EMAIL; CRT G/S ORD ON PLTF'S MOT RE CNTPT & CVL BNCH WRNT (KUBE/WIXSON/D. ATTERBURY) CM, FTR SC3 Judge: Harthcock, Gayle M |
|
May 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing PLAINTIFF'S MTN FOR ORD RE: CONTEMPT & BENCH WARRANT; Jdg Harthcock agreed to hear Judge: Harthcock, Gayle M |
|
May 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Declaration Affidavit | |
May 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Return of Service | |
April 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Note for Motion Docket |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.