Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Pollard Vineyard Llc, filed a(n) Judgment Enforcement - Creditor case represented by Riel, Michelle Renee, against Tih Inc, in the jurisdiction of Yakima County, WA, . Yakima County, WA Superior Courts with Elisabeth Tutsch presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeElisabeth Tutsch Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 11, 2019 |
CategoryTrj Transcript Of Judgment |
Last RefreshedOctober 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationYakima County, WA |
Matter TypeJudgment Enforcement |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Judgment on Answer of Garnishee Defendant
Judge: Tutsch, Elisabeth M |
|
January 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Declaration Affidavit | |
January 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion FOR JUDGMENT AND ORDER TO PAY |
|
December 09, 2019 | Docket Event | Answer to Writ of Garnishment | |
December 05, 2019 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
November 21, 2019 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
November 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
Writ of Garnishment - ISSUED |
|
November 18, 2019 | Docket Event | Affidavit for Garnishment | |
July 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Transfer of Judgment | |
July 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Transcript of Judgment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.