Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Manka, Jonathan, Manka, Tamara, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Hale, Megan Elizabeth, against City Of Yakima, Stevie, Shane, represented by Simmons, Bret S., in the jurisdiction of Yakima County, WA, . Yakima County, WA Superior Courts with Susan C. Arb presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSusan C. Arb Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 25, 2019 |
CategoryTmv Tort - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedOctober 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationYakima County, WA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 08, 2024 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial-12 6-DAY |
|
August 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice for Trial Setting (JY-12 07/08/2024 @ 9:30 AM 6-DAYS) |
|
August 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Absence Unavailability | |
May 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Absence Unavailability | |
April 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing In Limine |
|
April 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial-12 recieved email on 6/3/2022 that all counsel agreed to a 6 DAY Jury trial. |
|
April 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion in Limine | |
April 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
April 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Stipulation & Order Granting Zoom Testimony Judge: Arb, Susan |
|
April 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Objection Opposition |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.