Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Mathieu, Richard L, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Smith, Bryan Gregory, against State Child Youth And Families, Yakima Valley Council On Alcoholism, represented by Judge, Daniel John, Kobluk, Gerald, in the jurisdiction of Yakima County, WA, . Yakima County, WA Superior Courts with Blaine G. Gibson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBlaine G. Gibson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 14, 2019 |
CategoryPin Personal Injury |
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationYakima County, WA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Mandate | |
November 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial-12 15 DAYS/ JURY 12 |
|
July 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Transmittal Letter Copy Filed CP 1-2,373 SENT TO COA. |
|
June 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Index TO CP 1-2,373. RE #78. |
|
June 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Designation of Clerks Papers | |
May 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Perfection Notice from Court of Appeals RE #75 |
|
May 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Transmittal Letter Copy Filed / APPEAL SENT TO COA III. RE #75. |
|
May 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Appeal to Court of Appeals | |
April 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Summary Judgment
Judge: Gibson, Blaine G |
|
March 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Summary Judgment Hearing (MG) STATE'S MOTION AND TRIUMPH'S MOTION TO DISMISS IS GRANTED; ALL OTHER RULINGS ON THE RECORD; COUNSEL TO PREPARE AN ORDER, NO ORDER SIGNED; (SMITH / JUDGE); FTR1 Judge: Gibson, Blaine G |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.