Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Reyes, Sandra, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Zimmerman, Guy Brandon, against Bolster, Jane Doe, Bolster, Mark, Shred-It Usa Llc, Stericycle, Inc, in the jurisdiction of Yakima County, WA, . Yakima County, WA Superior Courts with Susan C. Arb presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSusan C. Arb Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 07, 2019 |
CategoryPin Personal Injury |
Last RefreshedAugust 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationYakima County, WA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
August 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal With Prejudice AND MOTION (STIPULATED) Judge: Arb, Susan |
|
March 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Association of Counsel | |
February 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Intent to Withdraw | |
December 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Absence Unavailability (KEVIN PAGE & RICHARD AGUIRE) |
|
November 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Substitution of Counsel | |
December 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Absence Unavailability (KEVIN PAGE) |
|
October 21, 2019 | Docket Event | Answer | |
August 06, 2019 | Docket Event | Return of Service | |
June 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit -JEFF MINOR |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.