Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Hunter, Judy, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Ring, Jeffery W, against Pacific Northwest Aggregates, Inc, Ross Island Sand & Gravel Company, Co., represented by Daniels, Brad, in the jurisdiction of Yakima County, WA, . Yakima County, WA Superior Courts with Susan C. Arb presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSusan C. Arb Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 19, 2019 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationYakima County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Answer and Affirmative Defense -AMENDED |
|
December 26, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Intent to Withdraw | |
December 24, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Intent to Withdraw | |
September 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit of Ankur H. Doshi |
|
September 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Protective Order -Stipulated Judge: Arb, Susan |
|
September 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion -for Entry of Stipulated Protective Order -2nd |
|
September 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit OF ANKUR H DOSHI |
|
September 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion FOR ENTRY OF STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER - STIPULATED |
|
May 28, 2019 | Docket Event | Answer | |
May 13, 2019 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.