Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Yakima County, filed a(n) Msc2 Miscellaneous - Civil case represented by Harper, Kenneth W., against Bendzak, Colleen R, Bendzak, Braven S, Lehman, Brian, Hail Products Llc, represented by Nicholson, Douglas Warr, in the jurisdiction of Yakima County, WA, . Yakima County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 29, 2019 |
CategoryMsc2 Miscellaneous - Civil |
Last RefreshedMay 21, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationYakima County, WA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Closed by Court Order After a Hearing | |
July 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal
Judge: Arb, Susan |
|
June 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Clerks Notice for Dismissal for Want of Prosecution | |
April 17, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
April 05, 2019 | Docket Event | Response | |
March 29, 2019 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
March 29, 2019 | Docket Event | Summons and Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.