Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Brady, Nancy, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Favard, Kristi D, against Bleyhl Farm Service, Inc., in the jurisdiction of Yakima County, WA, . Yakima County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 02, 2021 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedMay 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationYakima County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
February 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal With Prejudice - STIPULATED Judge: Arb, Susan |
|
December 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Summary Judgment Deft's Motion |
|
October 27, 2020 | Docket Event | Note for Motion Docket | |
October 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Summary Judgment Def's Motion |
|
September 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing (AJ) CRT GRNTS 60 DAY CONT, CNSL TO RE-NOTE MT, CRT APPRVS PET MT, ORD G/S (K.FAVARD/J.ROSSITER) D4 FTRSC3 Judge: Gibson, Blaine G |
|
September 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order GRANTING PLAINTIFFS CR 56(F) MOTION Judge: Gibson, Blaine G |
|
September 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion to Continue on shortened time Judge: Gibson, Blaine G |
|
September 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
September 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Declaration Affidavit |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.