Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Deaquino, Maria, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Renda, Matt Andrew, against Reyes, Ignacio, Starke, Vicki Lopez, Starke, John Doe W H, represented by Delorie, Louie Vincent Jr, in the jurisdiction of Yakima County, WA, . Yakima County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 13, 2015 |
CategoryTmv Tort - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedMay 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationYakima County, WA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 15, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal With Prejudice (STIPULATED_ Judge: Naught, Kevin S |
|
May 15, 2017 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
April 24, 2017 | Docket Event | Arbitration Settlement and Removal from Arbitration Calendar | |
December 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
Note for Trial and Statement of Arbitrability ($220 pd) |
|
August 25, 2015 | Docket Event | Ex Parte | |
August 25, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal With Prejudice 12: STIP & ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH; PREJUDICE; |
|
August 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
Answer to Cross Claim 11: ANSWER TO CROSS CLAIM; |
|
July 06, 2015 | Docket Event | FILING FEE RECEIVED; | |
July 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
Answer and Cross Claim 10: ANSWER AND CROSS CLAIM; |
|
May 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Association of Counsel 9: AMENDED NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF; COUNSEL; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.