Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Dixon, Joanna, Dixon, Frank, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case against Yakima Valley School, Department Of Social And Health Services, in the jurisdiction of Yakima County, WA, . Yakima County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 05, 2010 |
CategoryPin Personal Injury |
Last RefreshedMay 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationYakima County, WA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 03, 2013 | Docket Event | Ex Parte | |
October 03, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order to Disburse Funds 21: ORDER TO DISBURSE FUNDS; |
|
October 03, 2013 | Docket Event |
Motion and Affidavit Declaration 20: MT & AFF FOR AN ORD TO THE CLERK; OF THE CRT TO DISBURSE SETTLEMENT; FUNDS; |
|
September 04, 2013 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Uncontested Resolution | |
September 04, 2013 | Docket Event |
Judgment 19: STIPULATED JUDGMENT; |
|
September 04, 2013 | Docket Event | Ex Parte | |
June 24, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Absence Unavailability 18: NOTICE OF ABSENCE/UNAVAILABILITY; |
|
April 12, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice Withdraw and Substitution of Counsel 17: NOTICE WITHDRAW & SUBSTITUT COUNSEL; |
|
March 11, 2013 | Docket Event |
Mail Returned Unclaimed 16: MAIL RETURN - UNCLAIMED -KATHY; LEONARD; |
|
March 08, 2013 | Docket Event |
Report 15: STATUS REPORT -MISTEE R VERHULP; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.