Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Bright, Marvin, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Englund, Brad L, against Griggs, Kevin, Griggs, Jane Doe H W, in the jurisdiction of Yakima County, WA, . Yakima County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 05, 2012 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedMay 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationYakima County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 05, 2012 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal With Prejudice 9: MT & ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH; PREJUDICE (MCCARTHY); |
|
January 05, 2012 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
July 25, 2011 | Docket Event | FILING FEE RECEIVED; | |
July 25, 2011 | Docket Event |
Note for Trial and Statement of Arbitrability 7: NT FOR TRIAL & STMNT OF ARBITRABIL; |
|
March 31, 2011 | Docket Event |
Report 6: STATUS REPORT -DANA P GAILAN; |
|
March 29, 2011 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF MAILING; | |
March 29, 2011 | Docket Event |
Clerks Notice for Dismissal for Want of Prosecution 5: CLKS MOT FOR DISMISS FR WNT OF PROS; |
|
February 03, 2010 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service 4: AFFIDAVIT/DCLR/CERT OF SERVICE; |
|
January 07, 2010 | Docket Event |
Answer 3: ANSWER -DEFT; |
|
December 30, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance 2: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.