Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Jprd Investments Llc, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case against Alvarado, Caroline H W, Alvarado, James, in the jurisdiction of Yakima County, WA, . Yakima County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 08, 2010 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedFebruary 04, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationYakima County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 11, 2016 | Docket Event | Satisfaction of Judgment | |
March 16, 2011 | Docket Event |
Release 19: RELEASE OR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; |
|
March 09, 2011 | Docket Event |
Answer to Writ of Garnishment 18: ANSWER TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; |
|
February 07, 2011 | Docket Event | WRIT OF GARNISHMENT (WITH FEE); | |
February 07, 2011 | Docket Event |
Affidavit for Garnishment 16: AFFIDAVIT FOR GARNISHMENT; |
|
February 07, 2011 | Docket Event |
Writ of Garnishment 17: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT -ISSUED; |
|
June 23, 2010 | Docket Event |
Judgment 15: JUDGMENT (GAVIN); |
|
June 23, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice of Association of Counsel 14: NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL; |
|
June 23, 2010 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Uncontested Resolution | |
June 23, 2010 | Docket Event | COURT HEARING MINUTES; (GAVIN/LA) DEF FTA, G/S ORD SUMMARY; JUDGMENT (SEALBY) AD/PM FTRYS1; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.