Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Goudie, Judy A, Goudie, Mark R W H, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case against Clippinger, Mark S Md, Toppenish Community Hopital, Health Management Associates, represented by Aiken, Jerome R., in the jurisdiction of Yakima County, WA, . Yakima County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 02, 2008 |
CategoryMed Medical Malpractice |
Last RefreshedFebruary 04, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationYakima County, WA |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 05, 2010 | Docket Event | Jury Trial 12 | |
February 24, 2010 | Docket Event | Ex Parte | |
February 24, 2010 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal With Prejudice 33: STIPULATED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH; PREJUDICE (ELOFSON); |
|
February 24, 2010 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
December 04, 2009 | Docket Event | Summary Judgment | |
November 18, 2009 | Docket Event |
Note for Motion Docket 32: NOTE FOR MOTION DOCKET (AMENDED); |
|
October 20, 2009 | Docket Event |
Note for Motion Docket 29: NOTE FOR MOTION DOCKET; |
|
October 20, 2009 | Docket Event |
Motion for Summary Judgment 27: MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT; |
|
October 20, 2009 | Docket Event |
Affidavit 28: AFFIDAVIT OF JEROME R AIKEN; |
|
October 20, 2009 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Authorities 30: MEMORANDUM OF AUTHORITIES; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.