Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Household Finance Corporation Iii, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Friedl, Laurie K, against Contreras, Jose D W H, Contreras, Alma D, in the jurisdiction of Yakima County, WA, . Yakima County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 13, 2009 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedFebruary 04, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationYakima County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 20, 2009 | Docket Event |
Order Vacating Judgment 10: ORDER VACATING JUDGMENT &; |
|
April 20, 2009 | Docket Event | Ex Parte | |
April 20, 2009 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
April 16, 2009 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss 8: MT FOR ORDER VACATING JDGMT &; DISMISSAL; |
|
April 16, 2009 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss 9: MT FOR ORDER VACATING JDGMT &; DISMISSAL; |
|
February 11, 2009 | Docket Event |
Answer to Writ of Garnishment 7: ANSWER TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; |
|
February 06, 2009 | Docket Event |
Release 6: RELEASE OF WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; |
|
January 13, 2009 | Docket Event |
Writ of Garnishment 5: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT -ISSUED; |
|
January 13, 2009 | Docket Event | WRIT OF GARNISHMENT (WITH FEE); | |
January 13, 2009 | Docket Event |
Affidavit for Garnishment 4: AFFIDAVIT FOR GARNISHMENT; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.