Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Aspen Real Estate Llc, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Trujillo, David Burton, against Lemon, Jane Doe H W, Lemon, Douglas H, in the jurisdiction of Yakima County, WA, . Yakima County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 08, 2009 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedFebruary 03, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationYakima County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 27, 2012 | Docket Event | Ex Parte | |
June 27, 2012 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Closure by Clerk | |
June 27, 2012 | Docket Event |
Clerks Order of Dismissal 26: CLERK'S ORDER OF DISMISSAL; (HARTHCOCK); |
|
May 17, 2012 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF MAILING; | |
May 17, 2012 | Docket Event |
Clerks Notice for Dismissal for Want of Prosecution 25: CLKS MOT FOR DISMISS FR WNT OF PROS; |
|
April 21, 2011 | Docket Event |
Note for Trial and Statement of NonArbitrability 24: RENOTE NT FOR TRIAL & STMNT OF; NONARBITRA; |
|
April 19, 2011 | Docket Event | Jury Trial 12 | |
January 27, 2011 | Docket Event |
Trial Clerks Setting 23: RESET TRIAL CLERK'S SETTING (JY12; 04/19/11 3D 9:30AM); |
|
August 24, 2010 | Docket Event | Jury Trial 12 | |
August 10, 2010 | Docket Event |
Agreed Order 22: STIPULATION & AGREED ORDER; GRANTING MT FOR CONTINUANCE; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.