Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Wilks, Monroe S, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Mazzola, Russell James, against Lua, Leopoldo, in the jurisdiction of Yakima County, WA, . Yakima County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 22, 2009 |
CategoryTmv Tort - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedFebruary 04, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationYakima County, WA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 21, 2011 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal 14: ORDER OF DISMISSAL (HARTHCOCK); |
|
June 21, 2011 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss 13: MOTION TO DISMISS; |
|
June 21, 2011 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
June 21, 2011 | Docket Event | Ex Parte | |
May 19, 2011 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF MAILING; | |
May 19, 2011 | Docket Event |
Clerks Notice for Dismissal for Want of Prosecution 12: CLKS MOT FOR DISMISS FR WNT OF PROS; |
|
April 06, 2010 | Docket Event | Ex Parte | |
April 01, 2010 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal With Prejudice 11: STIPULATED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH; PREJUDICE AS TO DEF; VALLE-GUTIERREZ ONLY; |
|
April 01, 2010 | Docket Event | Ex Parte | |
March 31, 2010 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal 10: STIPULATED ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF; DEFT MURILLO (HARTHCOCK); |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.