Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Ozuna, Joe F, filed a(n) Admin Appeals - Administrative case represented by Comfort, Kathryn Carman, against Department Of Labor And Industries, Longview Fibre Company, represented by Leeland, Randall D., in the jurisdiction of Yakima County, WA, . Yakima County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 14, 2008 |
CategoryAlr Administrative Law Review |
Last RefreshedOctober 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaAdministrative |
Filing LocationYakima County, WA |
Matter TypeAdmin Appeals |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 05, 2011 | Docket Event |
Judgment 21: JUDGMENT & ORDER (HARTHCOCK); |
|
April 05, 2011 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Uncontested Resolution | |
April 05, 2011 | Docket Event | Ex Parte | |
October 15, 2010 | Docket Event |
Courts Decision 20: COURT'S DECISION - ELOFSON; |
|
September 22, 2010 | Docket Event |
Non-Jury Trial Certified Appeal Brd Record (Bulk Storage-Bsmt #1) |
|
September 22, 2010 | Docket Event | COURT HEARING MINUTES; (ELOFSON/KE) LAUMAN/LEELAND;; OPENING STATEMENTS, RESPONSE; CT; TOOK UNDER ADVISEMENT; FTRYSYC4; | |
June 24, 2010 | Docket Event |
Trial Clerks Setting 19: RESET TRIAL CLERK'S SETTING (NJY; 09/22/10 1D); |
|
June 02, 2010 | Docket Event |
Non-Jury Trial Certified Appeal Brd Record (Bulk Storage - Basement 1). |
|
March 25, 2010 | Docket Event |
Trial Clerks Setting 18: RESET TRIAL CLERK'S SETTING (NJY; 06/02/10 1D); |
|
December 16, 2009 | Docket Event |
Non-Jury Trial Certified Appeal Board Record (Bulk Storage-Bsmt 1) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.