Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case against Huck, Gary, Huck, Jane Doe H W, in the jurisdiction of Yakima County, WA, . Yakima County, WA Superior Courts with Kevin S. Naught presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKevin S. Naught Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 08, 2008 |
CategoryTax Warrants |
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationYakima County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 03, 2016 | Docket Event | Satisfaction of Judgment | |
March 03, 2016 | Docket Event |
Satisfaction of Judgment On Answer Against Garnishee |
|
February 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit Re: Military Srvc of Garnishee |
|
February 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit Re: Military Srvc |
|
February 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
Judgment on Answer of Garnishee Defendant
Judge: Naught, Kevin S |
|
February 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Declaration of Mailing | |
December 31, 2015 | Docket Event |
Answer to Writ of Garnishment -2nd |
|
October 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Answer to Writ of Garnishment -1st |
|
October 14, 2015 | Docket Event |
Writ Of Garnishment (With Fee) 22: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT -ISSUED; |
|
October 14, 2015 | Docket Event |
Affidavit for Garnishment 21: AFFIDAVIT FOR GARNISHMENT; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.