Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Fencing And Awning Inc, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Fjeld, Carter Lynn, against Adj Investor Group Llc, in the jurisdiction of Yakima County, WA, . Yakima County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 02, 2008 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedMay 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationYakima County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 13, 2009 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss 33: AGREED TO MOTION TO DISMISS; |
|
March 13, 2009 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal With Prejudice 34: AGREED TO ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH; PREJUDICE; |
|
March 13, 2009 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
March 13, 2009 | Docket Event | Ex Parte | |
March 06, 2009 | Docket Event |
Arbitration Settlement and Removal from Arbitration Calendar 32: ARB STTLMNT & REMOVAL FROM ARB CAL; |
|
April 23, 2008 | Docket Event | FILING FEE RECEIVED; | |
April 23, 2008 | Docket Event |
Note for Trial and Statement of Arbitrability 30: NT FOR TRIAL & STMNT OF ARBITRABIL; |
|
April 18, 2008 | Docket Event | COURT HEARING MINUTES; (HACKETT/RP) STK NA PER CRT.CM; FTRYC5; | |
April 18, 2008 | Docket Event | Default | |
April 15, 2008 | Docket Event | Summary Judgment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.