Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Crown Asset Managment Llc, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Rahlfs, Roger Edward, against Martinez, Martha S, Martinez, John Doe W H, in the jurisdiction of Yakima County, WA, . Yakima County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 12, 2007 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedJanuary 31, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationYakima County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 24, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order Extending Judgment
Judge: Harthcock, Gayle M |
|
October 24, 2016 | Docket Event |
Petition for Ord to Renew Jdgmt |
|
August 09, 2012 | Docket Event |
Answer to Writ of Garnishment 47: ANSWER TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; |
|
July 10, 2012 | Docket Event | WRIT OF GARNISHMENT (WITH FEE); | |
July 10, 2012 | Docket Event |
Affidavit for Garnishment 45: AFFIDAVIT FOR GARNISHMENT; |
|
July 10, 2012 | Docket Event |
Writ of Garnishment 46: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT -ISSUED; |
|
August 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice Withdraw and Substitution of Counsel 44: NOTICE WITHDRAW & SUBSTITUT COUNSEL; |
|
January 12, 2010 | Docket Event |
Answer to Writ of Garnishment 43: ANSWER TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT -1ST; |
|
December 28, 2009 | Docket Event |
Affidavit for Garnishment 41: AFFIDAVIT FOR GARNISHMENT; |
|
December 28, 2009 | Docket Event |
Writ of Garnishment 42: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT -ISSUED; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.