Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Worldwide Asset Purchasing Llc, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Johannes, Randall Dean, against Edler, Terry, in the jurisdiction of Yakima County, WA, . Yakima County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 11, 2006 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationYakima County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 18, 2016 | Docket Event | Satisfaction of Judgment | |
July 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
Answer to Writ of Garnishment 20: ANSWER TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; |
|
June 20, 2014 | Docket Event |
Writ Of Garnishment (With Fee) 19: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT -ISSUED; |
|
June 20, 2014 | Docket Event |
Affidavit for Garnishment 18: AFFIDAVIT FOR GARNISHMENT; |
|
April 22, 2014 | Docket Event |
Judgment on Answer of Garnishee Defendant 17: JDGMT ON ANSWER OF GARN DEF; |
|
April 22, 2014 | Docket Event |
Affidavit for Garnishment 16: AFFIDAVIT FOR GARNISHMENT; |
|
April 22, 2014 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of NonMilitary Service 15: AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE; |
|
April 22, 2014 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service 14: AFFIDAVIT/DCLR/CERT OF SERVICE; |
|
April 22, 2014 | Docket Event | Ex Parte | |
March 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
Answer to Writ of Garnishment 13: ANSWER TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.