Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Ford Motor Credit, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Layman, Patrick James, against Fankhouser, Jane Doe H W, Fankhouser, Todd A, in the jurisdiction of Yakima County, WA, . Yakima County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 08, 2007 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedJanuary 31, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationYakima County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 26, 2008 | Docket Event |
Satisfaction of Judgment 68: SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT; |
|
December 05, 2008 | Docket Event |
Release 67: RELEASE OF WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; |
|
November 10, 2008 | Docket Event |
Answer to Writ of Garnishment 66: ANSWER TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT -2ND; |
|
September 23, 2008 | Docket Event |
Judgment Against Garnishee Defendant 65: JUDGMENT AGAINST GARNISHEE DEFENDNT; |
|
September 19, 2008 | Docket Event | Ex Parte | |
September 19, 2008 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Mailing 64: DECLARATION OF MAILING; |
|
September 19, 2008 | Docket Event |
Motion and Affidavit Declaration 63: MOTION AND DCLR FOR GARNISHMENT; |
|
September 12, 2008 | Docket Event |
Answer to Writ of Garnishment 62: ANSWER TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; |
|
September 09, 2008 | Docket Event |
Trust Received - Garnishment TRUST RCVD-GARNISHMENT RECEIVED; FROM GAMESTOP, INC CK#849694; |
|
August 15, 2008 | Docket Event |
Answer to Writ of Garnishment 61: ANSWER TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT -2ND; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.