Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Halverson, Joshua Lee filed a(n) Cpo Civil Protection Order case in the jurisdiction of Whitman County, WA, . Whitman County, WA Superior Courts with Gary J. Libey presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGary J. Libey Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 31, 2022 |
CategoryCpo Civil Protection Order |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationWhitman County, WA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Denying Motion Petition
Judge: Libey, Gary |
|
May 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion for Temporary Order | |
January 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Parenting Plan Temporary
Judge: Libey, Gary |
|
January 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Terminating Protection Order
Judge: Libey, Gary |
|
January 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Report DOCUMENTS |
|
January 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Libey, Gary |
|
January 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing
Judge: Libey, Gary |
|
January 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Note for Calendar Court Administrator | |
November 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
November 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion for Reconsideration |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.