Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Dra Real Estate, filed a(n) case represented by Mize, Cole Wesley, against All Other Occupants, Johnson, Ian, represented by Denney, Kristi J., in the jurisdiction of Whitman County, WA, . Whitman County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Filing DateAugust 05, 2022 |
Last RefreshedAugust 26, 2022 |
Filing LocationWhitman County, WA |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
Show Cause
Judge: Libey, Gary |
|
August 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit M EDENSO |
|
August 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion TO STRIKE |
|
August 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Answer and Affirmative Defense & MOTION TO DISMISS |
|
August 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit M RUCK |
|
August 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Return of Service | |
August 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
August 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Order Appointing Attorney | |
August 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Show Cause
Judge: Libey, Gary |
|
August 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause AMENDED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.