Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Anderson, Raymond D filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case in the jurisdiction of Whitman County, WA, . Whitman County, WA Superior Courts with Gary J. Libey presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGary J. Libey Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 09, 2022 |
CategoryDvp Domestic Violence |
Last RefreshedAugust 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWhitman County, WA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Sheriffs Return on Service | |
May 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Modifying Protection Order
Judge: Libey, Gary |
|
May 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Libey, Gary |
|
May 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Restraining Order
Judge: Libey, Gary |
|
May 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order for Hearing RO MODIFICATION |
|
May 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Protected Persons Motion to Terminate PO | |
September 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Modifying Terminating Terms of Protective Order
Judge: Libey, Gary |
|
September 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Libey, Gary |
|
September 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Protection Order
Judge: Libey, Gary |
|
September 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.