Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Delgado, Brenda, Delgado, Julio, Jd Construction Llc, filed a(n) Msc2 Miscellaneous - Civil case represented by Young, Dan Robert, against Diesel Farms Llc, Perez, Daniel, Perez, Veronica, represented by Edelblute, William D., in the jurisdiction of Whitman County, WA, . Whitman County, WA Superior Courts with Gary J. Libey presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGary J. Libey Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 12, 2021 |
CategoryMsc2 Miscellaneous - Civil |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationWhitman County, WA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal With Prejudice | |
July 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
May 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Hearing Stricken In Court NonAppearance | |
May 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Presentation of Order
Judge: Libey, Gary |
|
March 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial
Judge: Libey, Gary |
|
February 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial
Judge: Libey, Gary |
|
February 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Readiness Hearing PRETRIAL CONFERENCE |
|
January 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing & SETTLEMENT |
|
October 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice for Trial Setting | |
September 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Absence Unavailability |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.