Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Ulibarri, Catherine M, filed a(n) Msc2 Miscellaneous - Civil case represented by Hanes, Paul Corbett, against Certain Underwriters At Lloyds London An Insurance Provider Doing Business In The State Of Washington, Risk Placement Service Inc Managing General Agents Underwriting Mangers Doing Business In The State Of Washington, represented by Benbow, Shannon, in the jurisdiction of Whitman County, WA, . Whitman County, WA Superior Courts with Gary J. Libey presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGary J. Libey Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 03, 2018 |
CategoryMsc2 Miscellaneous - Civil |
Last RefreshedAugust 19, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationWhitman County, WA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
August 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal | |
May 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Affidavit AND STATUS REPORT |
|
May 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Clerks Notice for Dismissal for Want of Prosecution | |
April 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Absence Unavailability | |
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Change of Address | |
March 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Absence Unavailability | |
May 20, 2020 | Docket Event | Satisfaction of Judgment | |
March 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Libey, Gary |
|
March 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order to Compel Production
Judge: Libey, Gary |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.