Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
O'Lexey, Larry A, filed a(n) Tto Tort - Other case against The Standard Disability Insurance Co, represented by Jensen, Steven Douglas, in the jurisdiction of Whitman County, WA, . Whitman County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 25, 2019 |
CategoryTto Tort - Other |
Last RefreshedMay 21, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationWhitman County, WA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
February 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal | |
February 08, 2019 | Docket Event | Hearing Stricken In Court NonAppearance | |
February 08, 2019 | Docket Event | Motion Hearing | |
February 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Hearing
Judge: Libey, Gary |
|
January 30, 2019 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
January 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
Letter TO JUDGE FROM O'LEXEY |
|
January 29, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
January 29, 2019 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Findings | |
January 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss BY STANDARD INS. CO. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.