Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Decker, Jenell R, filed a(n) Tto Tort - Other case against City Of Pullman, represented by Konkright, Kelly E, in the jurisdiction of Whitman County, WA, . Whitman County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 22, 2018 |
CategoryTto Tort - Other |
Last RefreshedMay 21, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationWhitman County, WA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 06, 2019 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
September 06, 2019 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal With Prejudice | |
August 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Answer CITY OF PULLMAN |
|
July 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
June 25, 2018 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
June 22, 2018 | Docket Event | Case Information Cover Sheet | |
June 22, 2018 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
June 22, 2018 | Docket Event | Summons |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.