Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Parsons, Matthew, filed a(n) Inj Injunction case represented by Hoopis, Laura, against Washington State University, represented by Deen, Nathan E, in the jurisdiction of Whitman County, WA, . Whitman County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 28, 2018 |
CategoryInj Injunction |
Last RefreshedMay 21, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationWhitman County, WA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
November 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal | |
March 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Restraining Order
Judge: Libey, Gary |
|
March 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement and Auth for Clerk to Strike Trial Date | |
March 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Order for Preliminary Injunction | |
March 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
March 02, 2018 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause | |
February 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice OF LODGING |
|
February 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
February 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion PETITIONER'S EXPARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMP RESTRAINIG ORDER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.