Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Davis, Phillip F, Davis, Tanya A, filed a(n) Lca Lower Court Appeal - Civil case against Cortner, Scott, in the jurisdiction of Whitman County, WA, . Whitman County, WA Superior Courts with David Frazier presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid Frazier Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 03, 2016 |
CategoryLca Lower Court Appeal - Civil |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationWhitman County, WA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 24, 2017 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Court Decision After Trial | |
February 24, 2017 | Docket Event | Mandate | |
February 24, 2017 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Mailing | |
January 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER TERMINATING NO CONTACT ORDERS Judge: Frazier, David |
|
January 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing ORAL ARGUMENT - APPEAL Judge: Frazier, David |
|
December 23, 2016 | Docket Event | Brief | |
November 21, 2016 | Docket Event | Return Receipt Certified Mail | |
November 15, 2016 | Docket Event | Brief of Appellant on RALJ | |
November 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
Transcript DISTRICT COURT HEARING 9-16-2016 |
|
October 17, 2016 | Docket Event |
Transcript 5: TRANSCRIPT; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.