Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Dawson Construction Llc, filed a(n) Admin Appeals - Administrative case against Washington State Department Of Labor & Industries, in the jurisdiction of Whatcom County, WA, . Whatcom County, WA Superior Courts with David E. Freeman presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid E. Freeman Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 23, 2021 |
CategoryAlr Administrative Law Review |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaAdministrative |
Filing LocationWhatcom County, WA |
Matter TypeAdmin Appeals |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Transmittal Letter Copy Filed of Clerks Papers Vol 1-2 to COA |
|
November 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Index to Clerks Papers Volumes 1-2 |
|
October 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Designation of Clerks Papers Amended |
|
October 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Designation of Clerks Papers Clerk Requested Amended 10/19/22 |
|
September 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Transmittal Letter Copy Filed of Notice of Appeal to COA |
|
September 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service of Notice of Appeal with COA |
|
September 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Appeal to Court of Appeals | |
August 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Court Decision After Trial | |
August 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law & Judgment Judge: Freeman, David |
|
August 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Courts Decision
Judge: Freeman, David |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.