Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Barrett, Bethany, Johnson, Emmett, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Murphy, Dennis P., against March Northwest Inc, represented by Meade, Philip Randolph, in the jurisdiction of Whatcom County, WA, . Whatcom County, WA Superior Courts with Lee Grochmal presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLee Grochmal Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 29, 2021 |
CategoryPin Personal Injury |
Last RefreshedAugust 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationWhatcom County, WA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
April 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal With Prejudice
Judge: Thorn, David M |
|
April 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Deposit of Settlement Funds into Blocked Account |
|
March 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Approving Settlement
Judge: Grochmal, Lee P |
|
March 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Grochmal, Lee P |
|
March 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Approve Petition for Minor Settlement Judge: Grochmal, Lee P |
|
February 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Note for Motion Docket | |
February 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Findings Order Approving Minor Settlement |
|
February 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Petition for Approval of Settlement Minor - and Disbursement of Funds |
|
January 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Report |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.