Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Mcintosh, David, filed a(n) Tto Tort - Other case represented by Coppinger Carter, Carrie M, against Mcdonald, John Doe, Mcdonald, Rebecca, Winco Foods Llc, represented by Stahlfeld, Susan Kathleen, in the jurisdiction of Whatcom County, WA, . Whatcom County, WA Superior Courts with Evan P. Jones presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEvan P. Jones Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 28, 2021 |
CategoryTto Tort - Other |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationWhatcom County, WA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Set Trial | |
August 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Change of Address Susan K Stahlfeld |
|
August 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Note for Trial Docket | |
August 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Absence Unavailability Carrie M. Coppinger Carter |
|
October 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Stipulation Amended Stipulation re: E-Service |
|
July 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
June 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service Amended |
|
June 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Denying Motion Petition to Compel Judge: Jones, Evan |
|
June 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Jones, Evan |
|
June 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel
Judge: Jones, Evan |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.