Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Lyon, Sharon V, filed a(n) Zoning - Property case against Whatcom County, in the jurisdiction of Whatcom County, WA, . Whatcom County, WA Superior Courts with Lee Grochmal presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLee Grochmal Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 27, 2021 |
CategoryLupa Land Use Petition Act |
Last RefreshedAugust 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationWhatcom County, WA |
Matter TypeZoning |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
July 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal Stipulated
Judge: Grochmal, Lee P |
|
June 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing Initial LUPA Hearing on Jurisdictional & Preliminary Matters per RCW 36.70C.080 Judge: Grochmal, Lee P |
|
June 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Stipulated Order in Lieu of Initial LUPA Heairng RCW 36.70C.080(5) Judge: Grochmal, Lee P |
|
April 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
April 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
April 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
April 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Note for Motion Docket | |
April 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Summons | |
April 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Information Cover Sheet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.