Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Rocha, Manuel, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Conner, Kevin W, Pepper, Benjamin Andrew, against Doe, Jane, Whatcom Transportation Authority, represented by Lee, Mark J., in the jurisdiction of Whatcom County, WA, . Whatcom County, WA Superior Courts with Evan P. Jones presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEvan P. Jones Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 18, 2020 |
CategoryTmv Tort - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedAugust 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationWhatcom County, WA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 26, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
September 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal with Prejudice Judge: Jones, Evan |
|
September 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Stipulation for Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice |
|
March 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice Withdraw and Substitution of Counsel | |
March 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Agreement Amended Agreement to Electronic Service Terms |
|
February 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Stipulated on Motion to Enforce Agreement on Motion to Dismiss Judge: Jones, Evan |
|
February 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Stipulation on Defendant's Motion to Enforce Agreement on Motion to Dismiss |
|
February 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Transferring to Mandatory Arbitration Stipulated Judge: Jones, Evan |
|
February 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Stipulation on Defendant's Motion to Transfer to Arbitration |
|
January 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing to Enforce Agreement on Motion to Dismiss Judge: Jones, Evan |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.