Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Lawrence Vineyards, Llc, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Ahrend, George M, against Abc Company 1-10, Does 1-10, John, Morell Family Wines, Llc, represented by Kovarik, Nicholas D, in the jurisdiction of Walla Walla County, WA, . Walla Walla County, WA Superior Courts with Brandon L. Johnson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBrandon L. Johnson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 10, 2020 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedAugust 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationWalla Walla County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Status Report | |
August 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Clerks Notice for Dismissal for Want of Prosecution | |
March 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Denying Motion Petition | |
February 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing order to be presented |
|
February 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing Motion To Dismiss Judge: Johnson, Brandon L |
|
February 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit Of Gurpreet K. Dhatt |
|
February 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Reply | |
February 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit georgr ahrend |
|
February 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Objection Opposition to motion to dismiss |
|
January 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Hearing Cancelled Plaintiff Prosecution Requested |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.