Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Little, Courtney A, Little, James S, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Coluccio, Kevin, Hess, Peter J, against Rosauers Supermarkets, Inc, represented by Hammond, Jonathan, Wraith, Steven George, in the jurisdiction of Walla Walla County, WA, . Walla Walla County, WA Superior Courts with Brandon L. Johnson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBrandon L. Johnson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 22, 2020 |
CategoryPin Personal Injury |
Last RefreshedAugust 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationWalla Walla County, WA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
July 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Action With Order | |
July 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal With Prejudice | |
March 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Action With Order | |
March 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Case Schedule 12 person jury trial-2/6/2024 2nd stipulated |
|
January 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Mandate - Reversed |
|
January 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial
Judge: Johnson, Brandon L |
|
July 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Intent to Withdraw & substitution |
|
March 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Receipts from Court of Appeals - Clerk's Papers |
|
March 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Mailing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.