Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Calton, Diane, filed a(n) Msc2 Miscellaneous - Civil case represented by Fomina, Vera, Skidmore, Gregory Mark, against Providence Health & Services, represented by Westlind, Dennis E, in the jurisdiction of Walla Walla County, WA, . Walla Walla County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 15, 2020 |
CategoryMsc2 Miscellaneous - Civil |
Last RefreshedAugust 24, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationWalla Walla County, WA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Status Report Plaintiff's |
|
August 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Clerks Notice for Dismissal for Want of Prosecution | |
July 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Clerks Notice for Dismissal for Want of Prosecution | |
June 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Substitution of Counsel Vera Fomina |
|
March 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Answer and Affirmative Defense Defendant's 1st Amended |
|
May 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
Answer and Affirmative Defense - 12 Person Jury Demand |
|
April 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Record on Change of Venue from king county |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.